This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:17:24 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO VS PALMER, DONALD J.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against PALMER, DONALD J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Los Angeles County Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0722

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Respondent

PALMER DONALD J.

Not Classified By Court

BELL DANASHAA S.

Others

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT

CSSD - SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Other Attorneys

BAUER ALEXANDRA M.

JENSEN-ELDRED MARCI A.

 

Court Documents

DSU - Notice - Registration of California Support Order

1/21/2022: DSU - Notice - Registration of California Support Order

Notice - Case Assignment

1/21/2022: Notice - Case Assignment

DSU - Judgment - Supplemental - 2nd Supplemental, Filed Mar 14, 2016, CSKS1204934, County of San Bernardino

1/20/2022: DSU - Judgment - Supplemental - 2nd Supplemental, Filed Mar 14, 2016, CSKS1204934, County of San Bernardino

DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 - Substitution of Payee

1/20/2022: DSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 - Substitution of Payee

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/20/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

DSU - Statement - Registration of California Support Order

1/20/2022: DSU - Statement - Registration of California Support Order

Proof of Service

2/3/2022: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDSU - Notice - Registration of California Support Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDSU - Notice Regarding Payment of Support FL632 (Substitution of Payee ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDSU - Statement - Registration of California Support Order; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Supplemental (2nd Supplemental, Filed Mar 14, 2016, CSKS1204934, County of San Bernardino ); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSSD - SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENSEN-ELDRED MARCI A.