This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2023 at 06:16:47 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS PUACSON, MOISES

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against PUACSON, MOISES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Los Angeles County Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KORN, JEFFREY W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0818

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KORN, JEFFREY W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

PUACSON MOISES

Not Classified By Court

LOPEZ CATI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

COHAN SABRINA S

 

Court Documents

DSU - Summons and Complaint

1/26/2022: DSU - Summons and Complaint

DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

3/16/2022: DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/16/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) - -Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage

4/5/2022: DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) - -Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage

Proof of Service

4/18/2022: Proof of Service

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Throughout the Case

5/20/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Throughout the Case

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Throughout the Case

5/20/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Throughout the Case

Declaration - AMENDED

5/24/2022: Declaration - AMENDED

Minute Order

5/24/2022: Minute Order

Declaration

5/23/2022: Declaration

Guideline Calculations/Results

5/24/2022: Guideline Calculations/Results

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/24/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Income and Expense

5/24/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

6/10/2022: DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

Notice - Entry of Judgment

7/25/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/25/2022

DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022

DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 41, Korn, Jeffrey W., Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Judgment - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Other Parent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketDeclaration (AMENDED ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketGuideline Calculations/Results

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketDeclaration; Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Throughout the Case ); Filed by Other Parent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2022

DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Throughout the Case ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022

DocketProof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketDSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022

DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less