Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 19:51:20 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS POWELL, JAYVONE L

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against POWELL, JAYVONE L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1809

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondents

POWELL JAYVONE

POWELL JAYVONE L

Not Classified By Court

LOGAN NADINE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Entry of Judgment

4/22/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

2/22/2021: DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

2/22/2021: DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

2/22/2021: DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

Declaration of Due Diligence

2/22/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence

Proof of Service of Summons

2/22/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

DSU - Summons and Complaint

11/9/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less