Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 11:48:10 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS OREJEL, LAURA MARTE

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against OREJEL, LAURA MARTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, ANGELA J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5648

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVIS, ANGELA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

OREJEL LAURA M

Not Classified By Court

CEDENO ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SMITH MICHAEL CARTER

 

Court Documents

Notice - Entry of Judgment

6/11/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

DSU - Stipulation for Judgment

4/16/2021: DSU - Stipulation for Judgment

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/6/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

4/6/2021: Minute Order

Request - Telephonic Appearance

3/8/2021: Request - Telephonic Appearance

DSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance - Granted - Michael C. Smith, Esq.

3/15/2021: DSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance - Granted - Michael C. Smith, Esq.

Proof of Service

3/22/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/19/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Service

DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) - -Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage

10/8/2020: DSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) - -Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage

DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

8/25/2020: DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

8/7/2020: DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

DSU - Summons and Complaint

6/5/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDSU - Stipulation for Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2F, Davis, Angela J., Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance (Granted - Michael C. Smith, Esq. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest - Telephonic Appearance; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Department 2F, Davis, Angela J., Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH MICHAEL CARTER