Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 05:09:41 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS MELENDREZ CONTRERAS, ARTURO

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MELENDREZ CONTRERAS, ARTURO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5647

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

MELENDREZ CONTRERAS ARTURO

Not Classified By Court

PICCONE ANDREA TATIANA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/11/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/18/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

9/18/2020: DSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610)

DSU - Summons and Complaint

6/5/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less