Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS MARROQUIN GONZALEZ, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against MARROQUIN GONZALEZ, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5628

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

MARROQUIN GONZALEZ MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

LAGUNAS VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

9/2/2020: Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

DSU - Summons and Complaint

6/5/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Without Prejudice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less