This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 17:47:00 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS LOZANO, BERNIE ROBERT, JR

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against LOZANO, BERNIE ROBERT, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and HERNANDEZ, DENNIS F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1927

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

HERNANDEZ, DENNIS F

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

LOZANO BERNIE R

Not Classified By Court

ORTEGA ALEJANDRA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Entry of Judgment

11/18/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 - For 08/18/2021

10/21/2021: DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 - For 08/18/2021

Minute Order

10/1/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Service

Miscellaneous - Findings and Recommendation of Commissioner

9/3/2021: Miscellaneous - Findings and Recommendation of Commissioner

Minute Order

9/13/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/18/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

8/18/2021: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Guideline Calculations/Results

8/18/2021: Guideline Calculations/Results

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/18/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

8/18/2021: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Minute Order

8/18/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/18/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/18/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Guideline Calculations/Results

8/18/2021: Guideline Calculations/Results

Request - Telephonic Appearance

8/4/2021: Request - Telephonic Appearance

DSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance - GRANTED-OTHER PARENT

8/4/2021: DSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance - GRANTED-OTHER PARENT

Proof of Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 (For 08/18/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 41, Hernandez, Dennis F, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Transferred to Dept. 2 for Judicial Review per CCP 4251(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFindings & Recommendations of Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Findings and Recommendation of Commissioner ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 41, Hernandez, Dennis F, Presiding; DSU - MTN (Initial Hearing) - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketGuideline Calculations/Results

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest - Telephonic Appearance; Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDSU - Ruling on Telephonic Appearance (GRANTED-OTHER PARENT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDSU - Notice of Motion (Initial) (-Judgment-Child Support-Health Care-Parentage ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less