Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 04:15:32 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS LORENZ, THOMAS M

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against LORENZ, THOMAS M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5548

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

LORENZ THOMAS M

Not Classified By Court

MONTANO RUBY M

 

Court Documents

DSU - Declaration - Amended Proposed Judgment

8/31/2020: DSU - Declaration - Amended Proposed Judgment

Proof of Service

9/4/2020: Proof of Service

DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

6/3/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDSU - Declaration - Amended Proposed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint (Summons and Complaint )

    Read MoreRead Less