Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2020 at 10:22:52 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS GUILLEN-GUILLEN, WALBERTO

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against GUILLEN-GUILLEN, WALBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5693

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

GUILLEN-GUILLEN WALBERTO

Not Classified By Court

CRUZ GALVEZ ROSALBA

 

Court Documents

Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

6/23/2020: Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

DSU - Summons and Complaint

6/5/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Without Prejudice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less