Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 08:45:01 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS FRANCO, JONATHAN RIGOBERTO

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against FRANCO, JONATHAN RIGOBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5514

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

FRANCO JONATHAN RIGOBERTO

Not Classified By Court

RIVAS MORAN KATHERINE SARAI

 

Court Documents

DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

6/3/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

7/28/2020: Request - Dismissal - Without Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Without Prejudice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint (Summons and Complaint )

    Read MoreRead Less