Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 08:59:31 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS ESCOBAR, ALEJANDRO

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ESCOBAR, ALEJANDRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1808

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

ESCOBAR ALEJANDRO

Not Classified By Court

LOPEZ NORMA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Entry of Judgment

4/9/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

2/17/2021: DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

2/17/2021: DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

2/17/2021: DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

Declaration of Due Diligence

2/17/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence

Proof of Service of Summons

2/17/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

DSU - Summons and Complaint

11/9/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less