Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 07:47:02 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS CRUZ PACHECO, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against CRUZ PACHECO, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5515

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

CRUZPACHECO JOSE LUIS

Not Classified By Court

ORTIZ QUEZADA SILVIA

 

Court Documents

DSU - Notice of Rejection-Judgment Re Parental Oblig FAM188

10/5/2020: DSU - Notice of Rejection-Judgment Re Parental Oblig FAM188

DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

6/3/2020: DSU - Summons and Complaint - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDSU - Notice of Rejection-Judgment Re Parental Oblig FAM188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430 (REJECTED 10-5-2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint (Summons and Complaint )

    Read MoreRead Less