Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 18:11:27 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS AYALA, MIGUEL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against AYALA, MIGUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1443

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondent

AYALA MIGUEL ANTONIO

Not Classified By Court

MARROQUIN FLOR DE MARIA

 

Court Documents

DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

5/11/2021: DSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630

DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

5/11/2021: DSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697

DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

5/11/2021: DSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620

Proof of Service of Summons

5/11/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

DSU - Summons and Complaint

2/16/2021: DSU - Summons and Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDSU - Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment FL697; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDSU - Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less