This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 05:11:29 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL. VS GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DAVIS M.D. M.P.H. MUNTO

Appellants and Defendants

MACARTHUR JOHN

GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF THE VALLEY

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC.

Not Classified By Court

JENNA ELLIS OF THE THOMAS MORE SOCIETY

AMICUS CURIAE GOVERNOR GAVIN NEWSOM

AUGUSTINE LISA

CARRILLO FELIPE

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC

VAN DYKE DIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORRISSEY EDWARD ALBURO

SCHRADER ANDREW LOUIS

SIEGEL AMNON ZVI

TOKORO JASON HIROSHI

WICKHAM MARY CONWAY

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIS JENNA

JONNA PAUL

LIMANDRI CHARLES SALVATORE

Not Classified By Court Attorney

GRABARSKY TODD

 

Court Documents

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal

9/3/2021: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B307910

9/3/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B307910

Request for Dismissal

9/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/11/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

11/9/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY AFTER BRIEFING COMPLETED

11/12/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY AFTER BRIEFING COMPLETED

Notice of Ruling

11/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER SCOPE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CAUSE RE CONTEMP...)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER SCOPE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CAUSE RE CONTEMP...)

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

11/16/2020: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF STATE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B307910, NOA 9/14/20;

11/16/2020: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B307910, NOA 9/14/20;

Declaration - DECLARATION 11/20/20 - DECLARATION OF MILAN BRANDON ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

11/18/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION 11/20/20 - DECLARATION OF MILAN BRANDON ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

Proof of Service - No Service

11/18/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON H. TOKORO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

11/19/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON H. TOKORO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/19/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS] TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

11/19/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS] TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CONTEMPT

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B307910: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by County of Los Angeles, et al. on 08/14/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by County of Los Angeles and Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B307910; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
217 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Or...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Davis, M.D., \M.P.H. to Davis, M.D., M.P.H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lodging Electronic Exhibits to Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Community Church of the Valley (Defendant); John MacArthur (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Muntu Davis; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Jason H. Tokoro; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Mark Como; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Mark Como; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Dr. Frank Alvarez; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff); Munto Davis, M.D., M.P.H. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less