Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 05:13:20 (UTC).

COTNER DJ PROPERTY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS DOOWY DOES IT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 COTNER DJ PROPERTY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DOOWY DOES IT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0262

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTNER DJ PROPERTY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SCHWARTZ DAVID

Los Angeles, Ca 90025 Los Angeles, CA 90025

DOOWY DOES IT INC.

Los Angeles, Ca 90025 Los Angeles, CA 90025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAYSON STEPHEN PRESTON

Defendant Attorney

COOPER JAMES SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

11/26/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

Answer

12/14/2018: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

11/27/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

11/27/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

11/27/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Cotner DJ Property, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Doowy Does It, INC. (Defendant); David Schwartz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Doowy Does It, INC. (Defendant); David Schwartz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((David Schwartz)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Doowy Does It, INC.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cotner DJ Property, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Cotner DJ Property, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER JAMES SHERMAN