This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 10:27:45 (UTC).

CORY WILLIS, ET AL. VS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 CORY WILLIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1779

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHANEY CHRYSTL

FOSTER NEIL

FOSTER ABIGAILE

WILLIS CORY

CHANEY MICHAEL

WHEELER ELIZABETH

LEONE CARYL

Defendants

MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION WITH ITS PRINCIPAL PLACE OF BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

MEDTRONIC INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CARTER K. AMANDA

COWPER MOZE

CROW CHRISTINA D.

SELBY DAVID L.

PIGOTT GINGER FLORENCE

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER ADMITTING ATTY DAVID L. SELBY, II AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/19/2021: Order - ORDER ADMITTING ATTY DAVID L. SELBY, II AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - ORDER ADMITTING ATTY CHRISTINA D. CROW AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/19/2021: Order - ORDER ADMITTING ATTY CHRISTINA D. CROW AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

7/29/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF DAVID L. SELBY, II TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

7/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF DAVID L. SELBY, II TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF K. AMANDA CARTER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF K. AMANDA CARTER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF CHRISTINA D. CROW TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/3/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF CHRISTINA D. CROW TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF CHRISTINA D. CROW TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF C. MOZE COWPER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION OF CHRISTINA D. CROW TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Order - ORDER GRANTING DAVID L. SELBY, II TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

8/3/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING DAVID L. SELBY, II TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice of Related Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR T.M.

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR T.M.

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in California (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Admitting Atty Christina D. Crow as counsel pro hac vice; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Admitting Atty David L. Selby, II as counsel pro hac vice; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDefendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Medtronic, Inc.'s Status Report; Filed by Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in California (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc., a Minnesota corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by K. Amanda Carter (Attorney); Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder granting David L. Selby, II to appear as counsel pro hac vice; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Related Cases) of 05/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for T.M.); Filed by Elizabeth Wheeler (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Wheeler (Plaintiff); T.M., a minor by Elizabeth Wheeler, his guardian as litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cory Willis (Plaintiff); Abigaile Foster (Plaintiff); Neil Foster (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDTRONIC MINIMED INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ginger Florence Pigott