Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 21:59:16 (UTC).

CORTEZ, CHEYANNE TISIANNA VS JILLY, CHARLES D.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 CORTEZ, CHEYANNE TISIANNA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against JILLY, CHARLES D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA and GARRETT, CARLA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0121

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

GARRETT, CARLA L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORTEZ CHEYANNE TISIANNA

Respondent

JILLY CHARLES D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/16/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Advanced from 4/20/21

4/16/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Advanced from 4/20/21

Minute Order

5/4/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Firearms Turned In/Sold/Stored

2/16/2021: Proof of Firearms Turned In/Sold/Stored

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/22/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/22/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

3/26/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

3/26/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Proof of Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

Petition - Civil Harassment

2/1/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/1/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/1/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/1/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Garrett, Carla L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Advanced from 4/20/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Garrett, Carla L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Firearms Turned In/Sold/Stored; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.