Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2020 at 03:00:56 (UTC).

CORRIDONI, PABLO VS CAMPOS, VALERIE HEATHER

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 CORRIDONI, PABLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMPOS, VALERIE HEATHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1256

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORRIDONI PABLO

Respondent

CAMPOS VALERIE HEATHER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (Request to Enter Default )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less