This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2022 at 15:39:44 (UTC).

CORREY B. AVNER, ET AL. VS IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CORREY B AVNER, filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0836

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JANINE AVNER CO-TRUSTEE OF THE AVNER FAMILY TRUST AND AVNER & AVNER 401K PLAN TRUST

AVNER CORREY B.

CORREY B. AVNER CO-TRUSTEE OF THE AVNER FAMILY TRUST AND AVNER & AVNER 401K PLAN TRUST

Defendants

IRG HOLDINGS MANAGER LLC

IRG MASTER HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FOLEY THOMAS GAYLE JR

GAMARNIK KEVIN DAVID

Other Attorneys

MILIBAND JOEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

7/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order - DECISION ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION: GRANTED

7/22/2021: Order - DECISION ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION: GRANTED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; TRIAL SETTING CONFER...)

7/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; TRIAL SETTING CONFER...)

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC AND IRG HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/15/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC AND IRG HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Request for Judicial Notice

7/15/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; AND DECLARATION OF CORREY B. AVNER IN SUPPORT

7/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; AND DECLARATION OF CORREY B. AVNER IN SUPPORT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

6/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/10/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

5/10/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Ruling

4/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DATED APRIL 1 2021 DENYING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

4/12/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DATED APRIL 1 2021 DENYING PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by IRG Master Holdings, LLC (Defendant); IRG Holdings Manager, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDecision on motion to compel arbitration: granted; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Trial Setting Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketReply (IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENTS IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC AND IRG HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by IRG Master Holdings, LLC (Defendant); IRG Holdings Manager, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by IRG Master Holdings, LLC (Defendant); IRG Holdings Manager, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN MASE IN SUPPORT OF IRG MASTER HOLDINGS, LLC?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by IRG Master Holdings, LLC (Defendant); IRG Holdings Manager, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Respondent IRG Master Holdings, LLCs Motion to Compel Arbitration; and Declaration of Correy B. Avner In Support); Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Order Shortening Time On Motion For Reconsideration Of Order Dated April 1 2021 Denying Peremptory Challenge To Judicial Officer); Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 2:45 PM in Department 86; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP ...) of 04/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (CCP ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (Of Errata To Petition For Writ Of Mandate To Enforce Member?s Right To Obtain Inspect And Copy Certain Records Of A Limited Liability Company Pursuant To Corporations Code 17704.10); Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Correy B. Avner (Petitioner); Janine Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner); Correy B. Avner, Co-trustee of The Avner Family Trust and Avner & Avner 401(K) Plan Trust (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less