This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 13:40:34 (UTC).

CORPORATE SPACES, INC. VS ROCKLEY PHOTONICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 CORPORATE SPACES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCKLEY PHOTONICS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2209

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORPORATE SPACES INC. DBA CSI FULLMER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ROCKLEY PHOTONICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALKANA ROBERT I. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/31/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/31/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

2/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING

Notice of Status Conference and Order

4/18/2023: Notice of Status Conference and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Rockley Photonics, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Rockley Photonics, Inc., a California corporation to Rockley Photonics, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Filing; Filed by: Corporate Spaces, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rockley Photonics, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Corporate Spaces, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rockley Photonics, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Corporate Spaces, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rockley Photonics, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Corporate Spaces, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Rockley Photonics, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less