This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 02:06:37 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS KATERRA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KATERRA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7766

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

KATERRA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMEL LAWRENCE J.

Defendant Attorneys

CAMPBELL GAVIN C. P.

PRAETZELLIS JACK C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docketat 1:34 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/07/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketStatus Report (DEFENDANT KATERRA, INC.?S BANKRUPTCY STATUS REPORT); Filed by KATERRA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by KATERRA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 5:00 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 11:15 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by KATERRA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by KATERRA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS