This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2022 at 22:25:26 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, VS BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIDGE TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5958

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FKA ROSENBERG BAGELS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CORPUZ JESSICA R.

RORK MATTHEW STEPHEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RORK MATTHEW STEPHEN

Other Attorneys

IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/7/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement

7/7/2022: Notice of Settlement

Order - Dismissal

7/7/2022: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION)

7/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) OF 07/08/2022

7/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) OF 07/08/2022

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC

6/17/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

6/17/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. MARK SMITH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE

6/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF J. MARK SMITH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA R. CORPUZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE

6/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JESSICA R. CORPUZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/17/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Substitution of Attorney

6/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 15, 2022, AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

3/16/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 15, 2022, AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED D...)

1/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED D...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED D...) OF 01/11/2022

1/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF UNSERVED/UNNAMED D...) OF 01/11/2022

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL

1/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 10, 2022 AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

1/5/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 10, 2022 AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER -- CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

11/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER -- CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC.

6/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dismissal Pursuant to Stipulation) of 07/08/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Dismissal Pursuant to Stipulation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE; STIPULATION FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 664.6; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY and ORDER THEREON); Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Bridge & Tunnel Restaurant Group, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JESSICA R. CORPUZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE); Filed by Bridge & Tunnel Restaurant Group, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF J. MARK SMITH IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF J. MARK SMITH PRO HAC VICE); Filed by Bridge & Tunnel Restaurant Group, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Bridge & Tunnel Restaurant Group, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Bridge & Tunnel Restaurant Group, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND, INC., a Delaware Corporation, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGE & TUNNEL RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A COLORADO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FKA ROSENBERG BAGELS is a litigant

Latest cases where CORNERSTONE ONDEMAND INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMEL LAWRENCE JENNINGS