This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 05:47:37 (UTC).

CORINNA COTSEN, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CORINNA COTSEN 1991 TRUST, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 CORINNA COTSEN, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CORINNA COTSEN 1991 TRUST filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4214

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CORAL COURTS LLC

CORINNA COTSEN AS TRUSTEE OF THE CORINNA COTSEN 1991 TRUST

Defendant

CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STACEY SHERMAN L.

Defendant Attorney

LEE ERICA BARBARA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

3/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/22/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO BIFURCATE CLAIMS AND EXTEND DEADLINES

2/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO BIFURCATE CLAIMS AND EXTEND DEADLINES

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/12/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

12/28/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition for Writ of Mandate

12/23/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

12/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Hearing07/13/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([Proposed] Order to Bifurcate Claims and Extend Deadlines); Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner); Coral Courts, LLC (Petitioner); California Coastal Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner); Coral Courts, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner); Coral Courts, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Corinna Cotsen, as Trustee of the Corinna Cotsen 1991 Trust (Petitioner); Coral Courts, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STACEY SHERMAN L.