This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:06:25 (UTC).

CORINE ULLOA VS CITY OF AZUSA

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 CORINE ULLOA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF AZUSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER A. HERNANDEZ and DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3711

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ULLOA CORINE

Respondents and Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1 TO 10

AZUSA CITY OF

CALIFORNIA STATE OF

CITY OF AZUSA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAFFNER JOSHUA H. ESQ.

HAFFNER ESQ. JOSHUA H.

HAFFNER JOSHUA H ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CARPENTER & ROTHANS & DUMONT LAW OFFICES

COLEMAN JOHN MICHAEL ESQ.

COLEMAN JOHN M.

RUTTER MARK DENIS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

5/15/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/23/2018: Unknown

Other -

5/31/2018: Other -

Declaration

7/18/2018: Declaration

Objection

9/17/2018: Objection

Declaration

9/17/2018: Declaration

Unknown

9/26/2018: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

11/2/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Order

11/7/2018: Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/24/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

1/25/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown

2/4/2019: Unknown

Ex Parte Application

2/21/2019: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

3/6/2019: Declaration

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/11/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

4/11/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice

4/12/2019: Notice

Notice

6/11/2019: Notice

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Notice (City of Azusa's Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Production Nos. 96 and 97 of the Fourth Demand for Production of Documents and to Compel Production); Filed by CITY OF AZUSA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Motion to Compel (City of Azusa's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demand for Production Nos. 96 and 97 of the Fourth Demand for Production of Documents and to Compel Production; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of John J. Stumre); Filed by CITY OF AZUSA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by CITY OF AZUSA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO LODGING OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS); Filed by CORINE ULLOA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT); Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
244 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by CORINE ULLOA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by CORINE ULLOA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Opposition; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Opposition (TO MSJ ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF AZUZA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUTTER MARK D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLEMAN JOHN M. ESQ.