This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2021 at 00:04:30 (UTC).

CORINA SULLIVAN VS FLORIA FORD

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 CORINA SULLIVAN filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIA FORD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU, STEPHEN MORGAN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0838

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN MORGAN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SULLIVAN CORINA

Defendant

FORD GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROUSIER SUSAN

Defendant Attorney

THIGPEN JORDANNA GABRIELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/3/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GLORIA FORD'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY MARCH 5, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

3/9/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GLORIA FORD'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY MARCH 5, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/9/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GLORIA FORD'S EX PA...)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT GLORIA FORD'S EX PA...)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY MARCH 5, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

3/10/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY MARCH 5, 2021 MINUTE ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

3/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/12/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JORDANNA G. THIGPEN IN SUPPORT OF GLORIA FORDS DEMURRER TO CORINA SULLIVANS AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JORDANNA G. THIGPEN IN SUPPORT OF GLORIA FORDS DEMURRER TO CORINA SULLIVANS AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE CASES

1/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

1/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/5/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Related Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (20STCV43619)

12/30/2020: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (20STCV43619)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Stephen Morgan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Gloria Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by Gloria Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JORDANNA G. THIGPEN IN SUPPORT OF GLORIA FORD?S DEMURRER TO CORINA SULLIVAN?S AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Gloria Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((20STCV43619)); Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((20STCV43619)); Filed by Gloria Ford (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Corina Sullivan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIGPEN JORDANNA G.