This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 14:41:04 (UTC).

CORINA MARTINEZ VS IHG MANAGEMENT MARYLAND, LLC, A GEORGIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 CORINA MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against IHG MANAGEMENT MARYLAND, LLC, A GEORGIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9573

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ CORINA

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ RAFAEL

IHG MANAGEMENT MARYLAND LLC A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

AL-CHALATI-MOELLER DANIELLE

Other Attorneys

NALBANDYAN AKOP JACOB ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/25/2022

2/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

1/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCT...)

Declaration - DECLARATION RYAN D. HANDLEY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR THE FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 9/22/2021

1/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION RYAN D. HANDLEY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR THE FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 9/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

9/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Case Management Statement

7/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

7/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/4/2021: Answer

Answer

5/12/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department STL-A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; MSC Timeslot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:47 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference) of 02/25/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed on Plaintiff's Counsel for the Failure to Appear on 9/22/2021) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanct...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of CMC); Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rafael Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by IHG Management Maryland, LLC, A Georgia Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Corina Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IHG MANAGEMENT MARYLAND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN AKOP JACOB