This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 10:43:16 (UTC).

CORENTHIA ANN THOMPSON VS CITY OF CARSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 CORENTHIA ANN THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and STEPHEN M. MOLONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7803

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON CORENTHIA ANN

Defendants

CARLTON ANDREA A.

MARY L. MORENO TRUSTEE OF THE MARY L.

CARLTON THOMAS L.

CARSON CITY OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 02/18/2020

2/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 02/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - Order Re: Motion to be relieved as counsel

10/23/2018: Order - Order Re: Motion to be relieved as counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/13/2018: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Attorney Jeffr...)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Attorney Jeffr...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

12/17/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/6/2018: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/6/2018: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service by Mail

11/6/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel;)

10/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel;)

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

10/1/2018: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

10/1/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

10/1/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/16/2018: SUMMONS -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 02/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil; Filed by Corenthia Ann Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docketat 5:09 PM in Department 4, Stephen M. Moloney, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4, Stephen M. Moloney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (by Attorney Jeffrey L. Molchan, Esq., as to Plaintiff Corenthia Ann Thompson) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Attorney Jeffr...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Jeffrey L Molchan (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Corenthia Ann Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARSON CITY OF is a litigant