This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 11:01:46 (UTC).

CORDOSO, NATALEE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 CORDOSO, NATALEE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0117

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ORTIZ LORRAINE

ORTIZ REBECCA HELENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

VO ALEX SILVA VAN

VO ALEX SILVA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/14/2021: Minute Order

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

8/5/2021: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Order - Deposit Funds - In Blocked Account

8/5/2021: Order - Deposit Funds - In Blocked Account

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

7/9/2021: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

7/9/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds

Minute Order

5/28/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

1/7/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds (In Blocked Account )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise filed on January 7, 2021 by LORRAINE ORTIZ. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VO ALEX SILVA