This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2020 at 20:16:36 (UTC).

CORAL MALDONADO VS. ERIC GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 CORAL MALDONADO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ERIC GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOWRY, STEPHEN M., SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA, KLEEMAN, DENA A, DURON, ARMANDO and TEMP JUDGE, PRO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0887

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOWRY, STEPHEN M.

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

KLEEMAN, DENA A

DURON, ARMANDO

TEMP JUDGE, PRO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALDONADO CORAL

Claimant

MALDONADO MIGUEL A.

Respondent

GONZALEZ ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NGUYEN DON V

Respondent Attorney

MACLYMAN JOHN JOSEPH JR

 

Court Documents

Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Sent to dept M and signed on 7/22/20

7/21/2020: Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Sent to dept M and signed on 7/22/20

Trial Brief

1/2/2019: Trial Brief

Stipulation and Order - Filed and Entered on 03/11/2020

3/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - Filed and Entered on 03/11/2020

Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Rejected on 3/10/20

3/6/2020: Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - Rejected on 3/10/20

FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

10/13/2017: FL_General Family Law - FL - Notice - Trial Setting Conference

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

10/30/2017: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service - Mail - Request for Order; Income and Expense Declaration; Declaration in Support of Fees

12/8/2017: Proof of Service - Mail - Request for Order; Income and Expense Declaration; Declaration in Support of Fees

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

1/9/2018: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

4/16/2018: Proof of Service

Exhibit List

1/2/2019: Exhibit List

Exhibit List - and Notice of Lodging Exhibits

1/4/2019: Exhibit List - and Notice of Lodging Exhibits

Proof of Service - Mail

1/18/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Proof of Service - Mail - Objections to Proposed Judgment

3/20/2019: Proof of Service - Mail - Objections to Proposed Judgment

Minute Order

5/29/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Application

7/10/2019: Ex Parte - Application

Minute Order

7/19/2019: Minute Order

Responsive Declaration

7/30/2019: Responsive Declaration

Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - (KP401K); Filed and Entered on 11/19/2019

11/19/2019: Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order - (KP401K); Filed and Entered on 11/19/2019

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Sent to dept M and signed on 7/22/20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Filed and Entered on 03/11/2020 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Rejected on 3/10/20 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order ((KPSCEPP-MG) (PLAN 34); Filed and Entered on 11/19/2019 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order ((KP401K); Filed and Entered on 11/19/2019 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Responsive Declaration to Request for Order and attachments ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketResponse (Default rec'd before Response was filed. - On Behalf of: Respondent: Gonzalez, Eric - Rejected on 2017-03-16 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketMilestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 03-16-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketMilestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketProperty Declaration (Separate - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketPetition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Maldonado, Coral - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-10 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less