This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 20:45:36 (UTC).

CORA RADLEY VS THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 CORA RADLEY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE BICYCLE CASINO, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6325

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADLEY CORA

Defendant

THE BICYCLE CASINO L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EGHBALI BENJAMIN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN CARLA J

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION SUBMITTING CASE TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

3/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION SUBMITTING CASE TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2022

3/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2022

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

3/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EVIDENTIARY HEARING 402 EC; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EVIDENTIARY HEARING 402 EC; HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBIT...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

11/10/2021: Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CARLA J. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROC

11/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CARLA J. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROC

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA STEPHENS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PRO

11/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CRISTINA STEPHENS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PRO

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR D

11/10/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR D

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CORA RADLEY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CORA RADLEY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF CORA RADLEY IN SUPPORT

11/22/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF CORA RADLEY IN SUPPORT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY, JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

11/30/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE STAY, JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/1/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

12/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Court Order); Filed by Cora Radley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Submitting Case to Binding Arbitration and Staying Judicial Proceedings; [Proposed] Order Thereon); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CORA RADLEY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by Cora Radley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF CRISTINA STEPHENS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.?S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities (DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF CARLA J. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P.?S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR DISMISSAL, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPetition (to Compel Arbitration and for Dismissal, or in the Alternative, Stay Judicial Proceedings); Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cora Radley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cora Radley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cora Radley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN CARLA J