Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:26:54 (UTC).

COOPER ENGINEERING INC VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF

Case Summary

On 12/06/2017 COOPER ENGINEERING INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5919

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COOPER ENGINEERING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC W

RASMUSSEN INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

L. A. COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

C. A. RASMUSSEN INC.

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GLADYCH JOHN A. ESQ.

GLADYCH & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant Attorneys

MARY C. WICKHAM COUNTY COUNSEL

MONTELEONE & MCCRORY LLP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

1/18/2018: DEFENDANT THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

12/22/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/22/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

12/6/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ENFORCEMENT OF STOP PAYMENT NOTICE

12/6/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ENFORCEMENT OF STOP PAYMENT NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by L. A. County Department of Public Works (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ENFORCEMENT OF STOP PAYMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY C. WICKHAM COUNTY COUNSEL