This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 03:10:48 (UTC).

COOPER ENGINEERING INC VS C A RASMUSSEN INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 COOPER ENGINEERING INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against C A RASMUSSEN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7808

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COOPER ENGINEERING INC.

Defendants and Respondents

C.A. RASMUSSEN INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GLADYCH JOHN A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GRIMM J. MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

2/14/2018: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/20/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

7/5/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/31/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES

1/22/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER RE RELATED CASES

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

1/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

12/26/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order -

12/5/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

12/7/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT C.A. RASMUSSEN, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION

11/2/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT C.A. RASMUSSEN, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/14/2017: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

11/17/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/11/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

9/28/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRKCT ;ETC

9/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRKCT ;ETC

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketLIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT C.A. RASMUSSEN, INC. TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cooper Engineering, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRKCT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOPER ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIMM J. MICHAEL