This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 11:54:22 (UTC).

CONTRACTORS PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY, INC. VS WORLD MECHANICAL, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 CONTRACTORS PLUMBING FIRE SUPPLY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORLD MECHANICAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1636

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRACTORS PLUMBING & FIRE SUPPLY INC.

Defendants

WEST THIRD APARTMENTS PRESERVATION LP

WORLD MECHANICAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALEK KEITH

Defendant Attorney

RAMIREZ JACOB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT WORLD MECHANICAL, INC.

1/4/2022: Judgment - JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT WORLD MECHANICAL, INC.

Judgment

1/4/2022: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/4/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...)

1/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...) OF 01/04/2022

1/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...) OF 01/04/2022

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/21/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WORLD MECHANICAL, INC.S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND C.C.P. 664.6

12/28/2021: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT WORLD MECHANICAL, INC.S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND C.C.P. 664.6

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/16/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOE T. OF KEITH SALEK ISO OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

12/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOE T. OF KEITH SALEK ISO OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEITH SALEK ISO OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

12/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEITH SALEK ISO OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...)

12/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUAN...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/6/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

12/8/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

12/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND C.C.P. 664.6

12/10/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND C.C.P. 664.6

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW;)

10/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW;)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Settlement Agreement) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudgment Against Defendant World Mechanical, Inc.; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment Pursuan...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment Pursuan...) of 01/04/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketReply (TO DEFENDANT WORLD MECHANICAL, INC.S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND C.C.P. 664.6); Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Contractors Plumbing & Fire Supply, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST THIRD APARTMENTS PRESERVATION LP is a litigant

Latest cases where WORLD MECHANICAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ JACOB