This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 19:28:25 (UTC).

CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA A. BEAUDET and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9007

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA A. BEAUDET

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

FETZER'S INC. A UTAH CORPORATION

CHUTE SYSTEMS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

KOVACH ENCLOSURE SYSTEMS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STANDARD DRYWALL INC. A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

XL FIRE PROTECTION CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STRUCTURAL SHOTCRETE SYSTEMS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TWINING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SHAW & SONS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAMRAN AND COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MASONRY CONCEPTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CMF INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EMSER TILE LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ADVANCED CABLE SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SNAIDERO U.S.A. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MACINTOSH CARRIE ANNE

Other Attorneys

CREYAUFMILLER TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/29/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Related Case

4/6/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/8/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Webcor Construction LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CONTINENTAL MARBLE AND TILE COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMSER TILE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUTE SYSTEMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XL FIRE PROTECTION CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant