This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2020 at 07:40:02 (UTC).

CONTINENTAL BANK VS DTA TRANSPORT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 CONTINENTAL BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DTA TRANSPORT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0090

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTINENTAL BANK

Defendants

KESABLYAN MARTIROS MIKE

DTA TRANSPORT INC. DBA MAT TRANSPORTATION AKA MAT TRANSPORT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSAUR BRETT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

4/17/2020: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

4/17/2020: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Other - - JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

2/14/2020: Other - - JUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

2/14/2020: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRETT H. RAMSAUR RE CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

2/14/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRETT H. RAMSAUR RE CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Continental Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by Continental Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT BASED ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Continental Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by Continental Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Brett H. Ramsaur re Calculation of Accrued Interest in Support of Application For Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment); Filed by Continental Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramsaur, Brett H