This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 13:19:13 (UTC).

CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS INC VS DAVID R WELLS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAVID R WELLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4919

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS INC.

MARTIN JOHN W.

FINSTAD HANS KRISTIAN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

STORYCORP CONSULTING

WELLS DAVID R.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

STORYCORP CONSULTING DBA WELLS COMPLIANCE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

RUIZ MIGUEL JESUS

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN W. MARTIN

MARTIN JOHN WILLIAM

ROBERTS REGINALD

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOHN W. MARTIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANCISCONI ERIC PETER

RUIZ MIGUEL JESUS

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROBERTS REGINALD

SANDERS JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

7/23/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND GROSS MISMANAGEMENT

7/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND GROSS MISMANAGEMENT

Answer

11/13/2019: Answer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/13/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Case Management Statement

11/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint

10/15/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CROSS- DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

10/9/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING CROSS- DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/24/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/30/2019: Reply - REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE / FILED BY CRO...)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE / FILED BY CRO...)

Request for Dismissal

6/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

6/21/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/14/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Answer - ANSWER CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS, INC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/14/2019: Answer - ANSWER CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS, INC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by John W. Martin (Cross-Defendant); Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Storycorp Consulting (Defendant); David R. Wells (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docket1st Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by Storycorp Consulting (Cross-Complainant); Storycorp Consulting (Cross-Complainant); David R. Wells (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint; Filed by Storycorp Consulting (Cross-Complainant); David R. Wells (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling ( REGARDING CROSS- DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER); Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); John W. Martin (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Content Checked Holdings, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND GROSS MISMANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STORYCORP CONSULTING A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCISCONI ERIC P.