This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 11:58:35 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. VS TRANSOCEAN RESOURCES MANAGEMENT, INC. DBA YAMIBUY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TRANSOCEAN RESOURCES MANAGEMENT, INC DBA YAMIBUY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3211

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC.

Defendants

DOES 1-10

WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRANSOCEAN RESOURCES MANAGEMENT INC. DBA YAMIBUY A DELAWARE CORPORATION; DBA YAMIBUY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/1/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICI...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICI...) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICI...) OF 12/09/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/10/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judici...) of 12/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judici...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSOCEAN RESOURCES MANAGEMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WISMETTAC ASIAN FOODS INC. is a litigant