This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 15:31:01 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. VS SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2980

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC.

Defendants

GILT GROUP INC.

SAKS FIFTH AVENUE INC.

SAKS & COMPANY LLC

GFBC GROUPE INC.

SAKS FIFTH AVENUE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

Defendant Attorney

LALLY AMY P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/03/2020

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/28/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Mail

10/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEMURRER HEARING

9/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEMURRER HEARING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 HEARING ON DEMURRER

8/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER 11, 2020 HEARING ON DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER...)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER...) OF 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER...) OF 08/28/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JUDITH M. PRAITIS AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, LLC; SAKS & COMPANY, LLC; SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, INC.; GHBC GROUPE, INC.; AND GILT GROUPE, INC.

8/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JUDITH M. PRAITIS AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, LLC; SAKS & COMPANY, LLC; SAKS FIFTH AVENUE, INC.; GHBC GROUPE, INC.; AND GILT GROUPE, INC.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE SCHEDULING NOTICE RE HEARING ON DEMURRER

5/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE SCHEDULING NOTICE RE HEARING ON DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/27/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice

4/27/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 11:37 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC (Defendant); Saks & Company, LLC (Defendant); Saks Fifth Avenue, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (- Defendants' (Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC; Saks & Company, LLC; Saks Fifth Avenue, Inc.; GHBC Groupe, Inc.; and Gilt Groupe, Inc. (?the Saks entities?) Demurrer to plaintiff's complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilt Groupe, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAKS FIFTH AVENUE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAKS & COMPANY LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant