This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 20:25:48 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC VS ROSS STORES INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROSS STORES INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0056

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC

Defendants

ROSS STORES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOES 1 - 80

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/20/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/20/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • Hearing11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ross Stores, Inc. is a litigant