This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 23:18:28 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., VS HAWAII SUPERMARKET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HAWAII SUPERMARKET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7747

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HAWAII SUPERMARKET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY;

SUPER HK CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-110

WEI CHUAN FOODS CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WALONG MARKETING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEI-CHUAN U.S.A INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAWAII SUPER MARKET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HAWAII SUPER MARKET INC.

HAWAII SUPERMARKET LLC

SUPER HK CORPORATION

WALONG MARKETING INC.

SUPER HK OF EL MONTE INC.

WEI CHUAN FOODS CORPORATION

WEI-CHUAN U.S.A INC.

OCM GROUP USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROCKMAN COMPANY USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TIFFANY FOOD CORP. A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

CATE CORPORATION AKA K&CATE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

HAWAII SUPER MARKET INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

Defendant Attorneys

PATTERSON GREGORY JOHN

STEVENSON ROSEANN C.

DOWNING KIRK

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND {PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

1/13/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND {PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/7/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/7/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WALONG MARKETING, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION

9/3/2021: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT WALONG MARKETING, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/14/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

12/31/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

12/31/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

10/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • Hearing12/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND {PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer (OF DEFENDANT WALONG MARKETING, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION); Filed by Walong Marketing Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Hawaii Super Market Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Hawaii Super Market Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWAII SUPERMARKET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant

Latest cases where HAWAII SUPER MARKET INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALONG MARKETING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OCM GROUP USA INC. is a litigant