This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 00:33:57 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. VS B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against B G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4186

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC.

Defendants

B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION;

DOES 1-20

PANTRYFUL. A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

2/2/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/30/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

9/30/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/14/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

10/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT;

10/24/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT;

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. on 02/02/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice; Complaint;: Name Extension: Without Prejudice; Complaint;; Result Date: 10/24/2022; As To Parties changed from Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff) to DOES 1-20 (Defendant), B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant), PANTRYFUL., a Business Entity Form Unknown (Defendant), Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); As to: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: PANTRYFUL., a Business Entity Form Unknown (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Reuben Yeroushalmi, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAddress for Reuben Yeroushalmi, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); PANTRYFUL., a Business Entity Form Unknown (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); PANTRYFUL., a Business Entity Form Unknown (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: B&G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC., a Delaware Corporation; (Defendant); PANTRYFUL., a Business Entity Form Unknown (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B & G FOODS NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant