This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 03:15:00 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST VS JANS ENTERPRISES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC , IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JANS ENTERPRISES CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8856

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

Defendants

AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

BOLSABUY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EL MONTE SUPERSTORE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JANS ENTERPRISES CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the Public Interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the Public Interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the Public Interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOLSABUY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; is a litigant

Latest cases where JANS ENTERPRISES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EL MONTE SUPERSTORE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant