This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 20:11:05 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC., IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST VS HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY PARK, LTD., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC , IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY PARK, LTD , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3826

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST

Defendant

HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MONTEREY PARK LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEROUSHALMI REUBEN

Defendant Attorney

LANDIS RYAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

6/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order - RULING RE: ATTORNEY RYAN S. LANDIS OF THE FIRM CMBG3 LAW PC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MOTEREY PARK, LTD

6/15/2022: Order - RULING RE: ATTORNEY RYAN S. LANDIS OF THE FIRM CMBG3 LAW PC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MOTEREY PARK, LTD

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/15/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/23/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/23/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Case Management Order

8/18/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling

3/24/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/8/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketRULING RE: ATTORNEY RYAN S. LANDIS OF THE FIRM CMBG3 LAW PC'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT HONG KONG SUPERMARKET OF MOTEREY PARK, LTD; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Ryan Landis (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Ryan Landis (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Ryan Landis (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:22 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Peremptory Challenge;) of 02/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order; Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the public interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the public interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the public interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc., in the public interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. is a litigant