This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 15:12:39 (UTC).

CONSUELO GERDTS FLORES VS COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 CONSUELO GERDTS FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A COLORADO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2349

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERDTS FLORES CONSUELO

Defendants

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH A COLORADO CORPORATION

DIGNITY HEALTH A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARELA GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/12/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/12/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/12/2022: Complaint

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/12/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2025
  • Hearing04/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consuelo Gerdts Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant