This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2023 at 10:00:36 (UTC).

CONSTANTINE PAPANICOLAOU, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 CONSTANTINE PAPANICOLAOU, filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7880

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOLDED WINGS LLC

PAPANICOLAOU CONSTANTINE

PAPANICOLAOU JOLENE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LACK WALTER JOHN

ARNETT ASHLEY LYNN

WHALEN DANIEL GLENN

WATERS GREGORY PAUL

WHALEN DANIEL CHARLES

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION ...)

12/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE .[21STCV21086]; HEARING ON DEMURR...)

10/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE .[21STCV21086]; HEARING ON DEMURR...)

Reply - EDISON DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

10/10/2022: Reply - EDISON DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

8/25/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO EDISON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

10/4/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO EDISON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF EDISON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

9/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF EDISON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - EDISON DEFENDANTS' NOTICE; DEMURRER; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/2/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - EDISON DEFENDANTS' NOTICE; DEMURRER; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EDISON DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EDISON DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

8/11/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION JOHN HUESTON

8/12/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION JOHN HUESTON

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE

8/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/02/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike [22STCV17880] scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike [22STCV17880] scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/09/2022 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) [BC6...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Strike .[21STCV21086]; Hearing on Demurr...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike [22STCV17880] scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 11/09/2022 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEdison Defendants Reply In Support Of Demurrer To The Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAddress for Daniel Charles Whalen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Constantine Papanicolaou (Plaintiff); Jolene Papanicolaou (Plaintiff); Folded Wings, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Constantine Papanicolaou (Plaintiff); Jolene Papanicolaou (Plaintiff); Folded Wings, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less