This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:51:14 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED CONTRACTING SERVICES INC VS LEO BAECK TEMPLE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 CONSOLIDATED CONTRACTING SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEO BAECK TEMPLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6119

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSOLIDATED CONTRACTING SERCVICES INC

Defendant

TEMPLE LEO BAECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKER MICHAEL J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/22/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

1/9/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Consolidated Contracting Sercvices, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Consolidated Contracting Sercvices, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consolidated Contracting Sercvices, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less