This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 11:37:46 (UTC).

CONNIE VALENCIA VS COSTCO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 CONNIE VALENCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6646

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA CONNIE

Defendants

COSTCO

COSTCO WHOLESALE

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROSHCHIY OLGA

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/6/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2024
  • Hearing10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Connie Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Connie Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Connie Valencia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO COMPANIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROSHCHIY OLGA N.