This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 02:39:03 (UTC).

CONNIE & GEORGE COHN VS CUSTOM DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION..;ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CONNIE GEORGE COHN filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CUSTOM DESIGN CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2113

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COHN CONNIE

COHN GEORGE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

CUSTOM DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION A CA. CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEORGE L. COHN

COHN GEORGE L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTIOIN WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Exparte proceeding (FOR RETURN OF IMPLEADED FUNDS) - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Order (RELEASING FUNDS DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFFS INTO THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT TRUST ACCOUNT, SIGNED AND FILED. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Order; Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application (TO RETURN OF IMPLEADED FUNDS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Order (EXTENDING TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ); Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Summons; Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by CONNIE COHN (Plaintiff); GEORGE COHN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUSTOM DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION A CA. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHN GEORGE L.