Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 14:57:30 (UTC).

CONNIE ALLEN, AN INDIVIDUAL, AS HEIRS AND SUCCESSORS-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOSHUA ALLEN, ET AL. VS MARIO AMIRBOUTROS YOUSSEF, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 CONNIE ALLEN, AN INDIVIDUAL, AS HEIRS AND SUCCESSORS-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOSHUA ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARIO AMIRBOUTROS YOUSSEF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7474

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONNIE ALLEN AN INDIVIDUAL AS HEIRS AND SUCCESSORS-IN- INTEREST TO DECEDENT JOSHUA ALLEN

ALLEN DAVID

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THE ESTATE OF JOCELYN STEPHANIE GOMEZ DECEASED

GOMEZ GLORIA

SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY

FARAG YOUSSEF AMIR BOUTROS

YOUSSEF MARIO AMIRBOUTROS

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FARAG YOUSSEF AMIR BOUTROS

YOUSSEF MARIO AMIRBOUTROS

Not Classified By Court

SAFEWAY INS. CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE DANIEL M.

Defendant Attorneys

LEE KATHRYN CLAIRE

TAAT ZHORDANIA THEONA

REISINGER ROBERT L.

SHAVER THOMAS WILLIAM

REISINGER ROBERT LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint

10/27/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/27/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Answer

11/2/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

11/3/2020: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

8/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

8/25/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

6/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Related Case

6/16/2020: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service - No Service

6/29/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Answer

6/29/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/21/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDARD ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDARD ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/18/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gloria Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Mario Amirboutros Youssef (Defendant); Youssef Amir Boutros Farag (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Estate of Jocelyn Stephanie Gomez, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 3:12 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases) of 10/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First); Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standard Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Connie Allen, an individual, as heirs and successors-in- interest to Decedent Joshua Allen (Plaintiff); David Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAAT ZHORDANIA THEONA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Kathryn C.