Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 18:20:07 (UTC).

CONNECT BY AMERICAN FAMILY VS DAVID GUZMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 CONNECT BY AMERICAN FAMILY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID GUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5767

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONNECT BY AMERICAN FAMILY

Defendants

GUZMAN DAVID

RAMIREZ JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARZ MARC A

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

4/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

3/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/10/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Connect By American Family (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONNECT BY AMERICAN FAMILY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.